Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2019
Bill April 15, 2019