1 | | - | H.B. No. 2422 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Anderson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2422 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 25, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Business & Commerce; May 14, 2019, reported adversely, with |
---|
| 5 | + | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0; May 14, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2422 By: Nichols |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the coordination of certain broadband projects by the |
---|
6 | 14 | | Texas Department of Transportation. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 201, Transportation Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 17 | | adding Subchapter H-1 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | SUBCHAPTER H-1. COORDINATION OF BROADBAND INSTALLATION |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sec. 201.671. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter: |
---|
12 | 20 | | (1) "Broadband" means a mass-market retail service by |
---|
13 | 21 | | wire or radio that provides the capability to transmit data to and |
---|
14 | 22 | | receive data from all or substantially all Internet endpoints, |
---|
15 | 23 | | including capabilities that are incidental to and enable the |
---|
16 | 24 | | operation of the service. The term includes a service that is |
---|
17 | 25 | | functionally equivalent to the service described by this |
---|
18 | 26 | | subdivision. |
---|
19 | 27 | | (2) "Broadband conduit" means a conduit, pipe, |
---|
20 | 28 | | innerduct, or microduct for fiber-optic or other cables that |
---|
21 | 29 | | supports broadband and wireless facilities for broadband. |
---|
22 | 30 | | Sec. 201.672. COORDINATION. (a) The department shall |
---|
23 | 31 | | provide notice on the department's Internet website of ongoing and |
---|
24 | 32 | | planned highway construction projects for which the department will |
---|
25 | 33 | | provide voluntary joint trenching opportunities in the state's |
---|
26 | 34 | | right-of-way for broadband providers. A broadband provider may |
---|
27 | 35 | | collaborate with the department to deploy broadband conduit or |
---|
28 | 36 | | other broadband facilities in those rights-of-way. |
---|
29 | 37 | | (b) The department shall give special consideration to |
---|
30 | 38 | | broadband deployment described by Subsection (a) that is likely to |
---|
31 | 39 | | improve access to broadband by rural or underserved communities. |
---|
32 | 40 | | (c) To the extent practicable, the department shall assist |
---|
33 | 41 | | political subdivisions in taking advantage of voluntary joint |
---|
34 | 42 | | trenching opportunities. |
---|
35 | 43 | | Sec. 201.673. REPORT. Annually, the department shall |
---|
36 | 44 | | submit to the legislature a report that explains the actions taken |
---|
37 | 45 | | by the department in carrying out this subchapter and identifies |
---|
38 | 46 | | any costs or cost savings to the state and private entities |
---|
39 | 47 | | associated with voluntary joint trenching opportunities. |
---|
40 | 48 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
43 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2422 was passed by the House on April |
---|
44 | | - | 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 2, 1 present, not |
---|
45 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
46 | | - | No. 2422 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 5, |
---|
47 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
50 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2422 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
51 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
52 | | - | 0. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
55 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
56 | | - | Date |
---|
57 | | - | __________________ |
---|
58 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 49 | + | * * * * * |
---|