1 | | - | H.B. No. 2424 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Ashby (Senate Sponsor - Fallon) H.B. No. 2424 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 25, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 15, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2424 By: Watson |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the creation of a micro-credential certification |
---|
6 | 14 | | program for public school educator continuing education. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 21.054, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 17 | | amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (i) to read as |
---|
10 | 18 | | follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | (a) The board shall propose rules establishing a process for |
---|
12 | 20 | | identifying continuing education courses and programs that fulfill |
---|
13 | 21 | | educators' continuing education requirements, including |
---|
14 | 22 | | opportunities for educators to receive micro-credentials in fields |
---|
15 | 23 | | of study related to the educator's certification class as provided |
---|
16 | 24 | | by Subsection (i). |
---|
17 | 25 | | (i) The board shall propose rules establishing a program to |
---|
18 | 26 | | issue micro-credentials in fields of study related to an educator's |
---|
19 | 27 | | certification class. The agency shall approve continuing education |
---|
20 | 28 | | providers to offer micro-credential courses. A micro-credential |
---|
21 | 29 | | received by an educator shall be recorded on the agency's Educator |
---|
22 | 30 | | Certification Online System (ECOS) and included as part of the |
---|
23 | 31 | | educator's public certification records. |
---|
24 | 32 | | SECTION 2. The Texas Education Agency is required to |
---|
25 | 33 | | implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature |
---|
26 | 34 | | appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the |
---|
27 | 35 | | legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that |
---|
28 | 36 | | purpose, the Texas Education Agency may, but is not required to, |
---|
29 | 37 | | implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations |
---|
30 | 38 | | available for that purpose. |
---|
31 | 39 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
32 | 40 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
33 | 41 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
34 | 42 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
35 | 43 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
38 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2424 was passed by the House on April |
---|
39 | | - | 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
40 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
41 | | - | No. 2424 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, |
---|
42 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
45 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2424 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
46 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
47 | | - | 0. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
50 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Date |
---|
52 | | - | __________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 44 | + | * * * * * |
---|