Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2430 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2019
Bill April 23, 2019