Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2439 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 16, 2019