Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2452 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019