Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2454 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2454
1+By: Price, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes, Miles) H.B. No. 2454
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2019;
3+ May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4+ Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to continuing education requirements for certain health
612 professionals regarding pain management and the prescribing of
713 opioids.
814 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
915 SECTION 1. Section 156.055, Occupations Code, is amended to
1016 read as follows:
1117 Sec. 156.055. CONTINUING EDUCATION IN PAIN MANAGEMENT AND
1218 PRESCRIPTION OF OPIOIDS [TREATMENT]. (a) A physician licensed
1319 under this subtitle who submits an application for renewal of a
1420 license that designates a direct patient care practice must
1521 complete, in accordance with this section, not less than two hours
1622 of continuing medical education regarding safe and effective pain
1723 management related to the prescription of opioids and other
1824 controlled substances, including education regarding:
1925 (1) reasonable standards of care;
2026 (2) the identification of drug-seeking behavior in
2127 patients; and
2228 (3) effectively communicating with patients regarding
2329 the prescription of an opioid or other controlled substance.
2430 (b) A physician must complete the hours required by
2531 Subsection (a) in each of the first two renewal periods following
2632 the issuance of the physician's initial registration permit under
2733 this chapter, with two of those hours to be completed not later than
2834 the first anniversary of the date of issuance.
2935 (c) After the period described by Subsection (b), a
3036 physician must complete not less than two hours of continuing
3137 medical education described by Subsection (a) every eight years.
3238 (d) The hours required by this section may be completed in
3339 any continuing medical education activity approved by the board,
3440 including medical ethics or professional responsibility education,
3541 and may be counted toward [and whose practice includes treating
3642 patients for pain is encouraged to include continuing medical
3743 education in pain treatment among] the hours of continuing medical
3844 education completed to comply with Section 156.051(a)(2).
3945 (e) The hours required by this section may not be used to
4046 satisfy any education required by board rule for certified pain
4147 clinic personnel.
4248 (f) The board shall adopt rules to implement this section.
4349 (g) Notwithstanding Subsections (b) and (c), a physician
4450 who on January 1, 2021, holds a license to practice medicine under
4551 this subtitle shall complete not less than two hours of continuing
4652 medical education described by Subsection (a) in each of the two
4753 renewal periods occurring after that date. This subsection expires
4854 January 1, 2026.
4955 SECTION 2. Section 157.0513(a), Occupations Code, is
5056 amended to read as follows:
5157 (a) The board, the Texas Board of Nursing, and the Texas
5258 Physician Assistant Board shall jointly develop a process:
5359 (1) to exchange information regarding the names,
5460 locations, and license numbers of each physician, advanced practice
5561 registered nurse, and physician assistant who has entered into a
5662 prescriptive authority agreement;
5763 (2) by which each board shall immediately notify the
5864 other boards when a license holder of the board becomes the subject
5965 of an investigation involving the delegation and supervision of
6066 prescriptive authority, as well as the final disposition of any
6167 such investigation; [and]
6268 (3) by which each board shall maintain and share a list
6369 of the board's license holders who have been subject to a final
6470 adverse disciplinary action for an act involving the delegation and
6571 supervision of prescriptive authority; and
6672 (4) to ensure that each advanced practice registered
6773 nurse or physician assistant who has entered into a prescriptive
6874 authority agreement authorizing the prescribing of opioids is
6975 required to complete not less than two hours of continuing
7076 education annually regarding safe and effective pain management
7177 related to the prescription of opioids and other controlled
7278 substances, including education regarding:
7379 (A) reasonable standards of care;
7480 (B) the identification of drug-seeking behavior
7581 in patients; and
7682 (C) effectively communicating with patients
7783 regarding the prescription of an opioid or other controlled
7884 substance.
7985 SECTION 3. Section 257.005, Occupations Code, is amended by
8086 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
8187 (b-1) The board shall require a licensed dentist whose
8288 practice includes direct patient care to complete not less than two
8389 hours of board-approved continuing education annually regarding
8490 safe and effective pain management related to the prescription of
8591 opioids and other controlled substances, including education
8692 regarding:
8793 (1) reasonable standards of care;
8894 (2) the identification of drug-seeking behavior in
8995 patients; and
9096 (3) effectively communicating with patients regarding
9197 the prescription of an opioid or other controlled substance.
9298 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies only
9399 to an application for renewal of a registration permit or license
94100 submitted on or after January 1, 2021. A renewal application
95101 submitted before January 1, 2021, is governed by the law in effect
96102 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
97103 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
98104 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
99- ______________________________ ______________________________
100- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
101- I certify that H.B. No. 2454 was passed by the House on May 2,
102- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 4, 1 present, not
103- voting.
104- ______________________________
105- Chief Clerk of the House
106- I certify that H.B. No. 2454 was passed by the Senate on May
107- 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
108- ______________________________
109- Secretary of the Senate
110- APPROVED: _____________________
111- Date
112- _____________________
113- Governor
105+ * * * * *