Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2477 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2477
1+By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 2477
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
3+ April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Intergovernmental Relations; May 6, 2019, reported adversely, with
5+ favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7,
6+ Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2477 By: Alvarado
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to automatic employee participation in and administration
614 of a deferred compensation plan provided by certain hospital
715 districts.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Section 609.007(c), Government Code, is amended
1018 to read as follows:
1119 (c) Except as provided by Section 609.202 or 609.5025, to
1220 participate in a deferred compensation plan, an employee must
1321 consent in the contract to automatic payroll deductions in an
1422 amount equal to the deferred amount.
1523 SECTION 2. Chapter 609, Government Code, is amended by
1624 adding Subchapter B-1 to read as follows:
1725 SUBCHAPTER B-1. PARTICIPATION IN DEFERRED COMPENSATION PLAN BY
1826 CERTAIN HOSPITAL DISTRICT EMPLOYEES
1927 Sec. 609.201. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. (a) This
2028 subchapter applies only to a hospital district created under
2129 general or special law if the district offers a deferred
2230 compensation plan to the district's employees under Subchapter B.
2331 (b) A hospital district subject to this subchapter may, at
2432 the district's option, elect to require automatic employee
2533 participation in a deferred compensation plan under Section
2634 609.202.
2735 Sec. 609.202. AUTOMATIC PARTICIPATION; DEFAULT INVESTMENT
2836 PRODUCT. (a) This section applies only to an employee of a
2937 hospital district that elects under Section 609.201(b) to require
3038 automatic employee participation in a deferred compensation plan
3139 under this section.
3240 (b) An employee automatically participates in a deferred
3341 compensation plan provided by the hospital district unless the
3442 employee affirmatively elects not to participate in the plan.
3543 Notwithstanding Sections 609.007(a) and (c), an employee is not
3644 required to affirmatively contract for and consent to participation
3745 in a plan under this section.
3846 (c) An employee participating in a deferred compensation
3947 plan under this section makes a contribution of three percent of the
4048 compensation earned by the employee to a default investment product
4149 selected by the plan administrator based on the criteria
4250 established under Section 609.113 and the rules adopted under
4351 Subsection (f). The contribution is made by automatic payroll
4452 deduction.
4553 (d) At any time, an employee participating in a deferred
4654 compensation plan under this section may, in accordance with rules
4755 adopted by the board of the hospital district, or its designee,
4856 elect to end participation in the plan, to contribute to a different
4957 investment product, to contribute a different amount to the plan,
5058 or to designate all or a portion of the employee's contribution as a
5159 Roth contribution subject to the availability of a Roth
5260 contribution program.
5361 (e) A hospital district to which this subchapter applies
5462 shall ensure that, at the time of employment, each employee is
5563 informed of:
5664 (1) the elections the employee may make under this
5765 section; and
5866 (2) the responsibilities of the employee under Section
5967 609.010.
6068 (f) The board of the hospital district, or its designee,
6169 shall adopt rules to implement the requirements of this section.
6270 The rules must ensure that the operation of a deferred compensation
6371 plan under this section conforms to the applicable requirements of
6472 any federal rule that provides fiduciary relief for investments in
6573 qualified default investment alternatives or otherwise governs
6674 default investment alternatives under participant-directed
6775 individual account plans.
6876 (g) The amount deducted under this section from an
6977 employee's compensation is not deducted for payment of a debt and
7078 the automatic payroll deduction is not garnishment or assignment of
7179 wages.
7280 (h) Using existing resources, the hospital district shall
7381 inform new employees of their automatic enrollment in a deferred
7482 compensation plan and their right to opt out of enrollment. Using
7583 existing resources, this information must be included as part of
7684 the new employee orientation process. The district shall maintain
7785 a record of a new employee's acknowledgment of receipt of
7886 information regarding the ability to opt out of enrollment in a
7987 deferred compensation plan.
8088 Sec. 609.203. DISCRETIONARY TRANSFER. (a) A hospital
8189 district may transfer an employee's deferred amounts and investment
8290 income from a qualified investment product to the trust fund of the
8391 deferred compensation plan in which the employee participates if
8492 the district determines that the transfer is in the best interest of
8593 the plan and the employee.
8694 (b) The hospital district is not required to give notice of
8795 a transfer under Subsection (a) to the employee before the transfer
8896 occurs.
8997 (c) Promptly after a transfer under Subsection (a) occurs,
9098 the hospital district shall give to the employee a notice that:
9199 (1) states the reason for the transfer; and
92100 (2) requests that the employee promptly designate
93101 another qualified investment product to receive the transferred
94102 amount.
95103 Sec. 609.204. ALTERNATIVE TO FUND DEPOSIT. Instead of
96104 depositing deferred amounts and investment income in the trust fund
97105 of the deferred compensation plan, a hospital district may invest
98106 deferred amounts and investment income in a qualified investment
99107 product specifically designated by the district for that purpose.
100108 Sec. 609.205. CONTRACTS FOR GOODS AND SERVICES. (a) A
101109 hospital district may contract for necessary goods and consolidated
102110 billing, accounting, and other services to be provided in
103111 connection with a deferred compensation plan.
104112 (b) In a contract under Subsection (a), the hospital
105113 district may provide for periodic audits of the person with whom the
106114 contract is made. An audit may cover:
107115 (1) the proper handling and accounting of public or
108116 trust funds; and
109117 (2) other matters related to the proper performance of
110118 the contract.
111119 (c) The hospital district may contract with a private entity
112120 to conduct an audit under Subsection (b).
113121 SECTION 3. Section 609.202, Government Code, as added by
114122 this Act, applies only to an employee of a hospital district subject
115123 to that section who initially begins employment on or after January
116124 1, 2020.
117125 SECTION 4. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
118126 section, the acts of a hospital district created under general or
119127 special law that relate to discretionary transfers of funds and
120128 consolidation of billing and accounting for deferred compensation
121129 plans provided by the district to the district's employees and that
122130 occurred before the effective date of this Act are validated as if
123131 the acts had occurred as authorized by law.
124132 (b) This section does not validate an act that, under the
125133 law of this state at the time the act occurred, was a misdemeanor or
126134 felony.
127135 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
128136 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
129137 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
130138 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
131139 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
132- ______________________________ ______________________________
133- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
134- I certify that H.B. No. 2477 was passed by the House on April
135- 12, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 3, 2 present, not
136- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
137- No. 2477 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0,
138- 1 present, not voting.
139- ______________________________
140- Chief Clerk of the House
141- I certify that H.B. No. 2477 was passed by the Senate, with
142- amendments, on May 19, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays
143- 7.
144- ______________________________
145- Secretary of the Senate
146- APPROVED: __________________
147- Date
148- __________________
149- Governor
140+ * * * * *