1 | | - | H.B. No. 2524 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Anderson, Collier (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 2524 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
| 4 | + | Justice; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2524 By: Whitmire |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the prosecution of the criminal offense of theft of |
---|
6 | 14 | | service. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 31.04, Penal Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 17 | | amending Subsections (b), (c), (d), and (d-1) and adding |
---|
10 | 18 | | Subsections (d-2), (d-3), (d-4), and (d-5) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | (b) For purposes of this section, intent to avoid payment is |
---|
12 | 20 | | presumed if any of the following occurs: |
---|
13 | 21 | | (1) the actor absconded without paying for the service |
---|
14 | 22 | | or expressly refused to pay for the service in circumstances where |
---|
15 | 23 | | payment is ordinarily made immediately upon rendering of the |
---|
16 | 24 | | service, as in hotels, campgrounds, recreational vehicle parks, |
---|
17 | 25 | | restaurants, and comparable establishments; |
---|
18 | 26 | | (2) the actor failed to make payment under a service |
---|
19 | 27 | | agreement within 10 days after receiving notice demanding payment; |
---|
20 | 28 | | (3) the actor returns property held under a rental |
---|
21 | 29 | | agreement after the expiration of the rental agreement and fails to |
---|
22 | 30 | | pay the applicable rental charge for the property within 10 days |
---|
23 | 31 | | after the date on which the actor received notice demanding |
---|
24 | 32 | | payment; [or] |
---|
25 | 33 | | (4) the actor failed to return the property held under |
---|
26 | 34 | | a rental agreement: |
---|
27 | 35 | | (A) within five days after receiving notice |
---|
28 | 36 | | demanding return, if the property is valued at less than $2,500; |
---|
29 | 37 | | [or] |
---|
30 | 38 | | (B) within three days after receiving notice |
---|
31 | 39 | | demanding return, if the property is valued at $2,500 or more but |
---|
32 | 40 | | less than $10,000; or |
---|
33 | 41 | | (C) within two days after receiving notice |
---|
34 | 42 | | demanding return, if the property is valued at $10,000 or more; or |
---|
35 | 43 | | (5) the actor: |
---|
36 | 44 | | (A) failed to return the property held under an |
---|
37 | 45 | | agreement described by Subsections (d-2)(1)-(3) within five |
---|
38 | 46 | | business days after receiving notice demanding return; and |
---|
39 | 47 | | (B) has made fewer than three complete payments |
---|
40 | 48 | | under the agreement. |
---|
41 | 49 | | (c) For purposes of Subsections (a)(4), (b)(2), [and] |
---|
42 | 50 | | (b)(4), and (b)(5), notice must [shall] be: |
---|
43 | 51 | | (1) [notice] in writing; |
---|
44 | 52 | | (2) [,] sent by: |
---|
45 | 53 | | (A) registered or certified mail with return |
---|
46 | 54 | | receipt requested; or |
---|
47 | 55 | | (B) commercial delivery service; [or by telegram |
---|
48 | 56 | | with report of delivery requested,] and |
---|
49 | 57 | | (3) sent [addressed] to the actor using the actor's |
---|
50 | 58 | | mailing [at his] address shown on the rental agreement or service |
---|
51 | 59 | | agreement. |
---|
52 | 60 | | (d) Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, if [If] |
---|
53 | 61 | | written notice is given in accordance with Subsection (c), it is |
---|
54 | 62 | | presumed that the notice was received not [no] later than two [five] |
---|
55 | 63 | | days after the notice [it] was sent. For purposes of Subsections |
---|
59 | 67 | | (d-1) For purposes of Subsection (a)(2), the diversion of |
---|
60 | 68 | | services to the benefit of a person who is not entitled to those |
---|
61 | 69 | | services includes the disposition of personal property by an actor |
---|
62 | 70 | | having control of the property under an agreement described by |
---|
63 | 71 | | Subsections (d-2)(1)-(3), if the actor disposes of the property in |
---|
64 | 72 | | violation of the terms of the agreement and to the benefit of any |
---|
65 | 73 | | person who is not entitled to the property. |
---|
66 | 74 | | (d-2) For purposes of Subsection (a)(3), the term "written |
---|
67 | 75 | | rental agreement" does not include an agreement that: |
---|
68 | 76 | | (1) permits an individual to use personal property for |
---|
69 | 77 | | personal, family, or household purposes for an initial rental |
---|
70 | 78 | | period; |
---|
71 | 79 | | (2) is automatically renewable with each payment after |
---|
72 | 80 | | the initial rental period; and |
---|
73 | 81 | | (3) permits the individual to become the owner of the |
---|
74 | 82 | | property. |
---|
75 | 83 | | (d-3) For purposes of Subsection (a)(4): |
---|
76 | 84 | | (1) if the compensation is or was to be paid on a |
---|
77 | 85 | | periodic basis, the intent to avoid payment for a service may be |
---|
85 | 90 | | (d-4) A presumption established under Subsection (b) |
---|
86 | 91 | | involving a defendant's failure to return property held under an |
---|
87 | 92 | | agreement described by Subsections (d-2)(1)-(3) may be refuted if |
---|
88 | 93 | | the defendant shows that the defendant: |
---|
89 | 94 | | (1) intended to return the property; and |
---|
90 | 95 | | (2) was unable to return the property. |
---|
91 | 96 | | (d-5) For purposes of Subsection (b)(5), "business day" |
---|
92 | 97 | | means a day other than Sunday or a state or federal holiday. |
---|
93 | 98 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
94 | 99 | | to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
95 | 100 | | An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is |
---|
96 | 101 | | governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, |
---|
97 | 102 | | and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For |
---|
98 | 103 | | purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the |
---|
99 | 104 | | effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred |
---|
100 | 105 | | before that date. |
---|
101 | 106 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
102 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
103 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
104 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2524 was passed by the House on May 7, |
---|
105 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 2, 2 present, not |
---|
106 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
107 | | - | No. 2524 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 2, |
---|
108 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
109 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
110 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
111 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2524 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
112 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
113 | | - | 0. |
---|
114 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
115 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
116 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
117 | | - | Date |
---|
118 | | - | __________________ |
---|
119 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 107 | + | * * * * * |
---|