Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2529 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2529
1+By: Leach, Lambert (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2529
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
3+ April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Intergovernmental Relations; May 9, 2019, reported favorably by
5+ the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the governance of public housing authorities.
612 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
713 SECTION 1. Section 392.032(b), Local Government Code, is
814 amended to read as follows:
915 (b) A commissioner of the authority may not be an officer or
1016 employee of the county. A commissioner may be:
1117 (1) a tenant of a public project over which the housing
1218 authority has jurisdiction; or
1319 (2) a recipient of housing assistance administered
1420 through the authority's housing choice voucher program or
1521 project-based rental assistance program.
1622 SECTION 2. Section 392.033(a), Local Government Code, is
1723 amended to read as follows:
1824 (a) The commissioners court of each county in a regional
1925 housing authority shall appoint a person to serve as a commissioner
2026 of the authority. Subsequently, the commissioners court of each
2127 county shall appoint successors to the commissioner of the
2228 authority appointed by that commissioners court. An appointed
2329 commissioner of the authority may not be an officer or employee of
2430 the county. A commissioner may be:
2531 (1) a tenant of a public project over which the housing
2632 authority has jurisdiction; or
2733 (2) a recipient of housing assistance administered
2834 through the authority's housing choice voucher program or
2935 project-based rental assistance program.
3036 SECTION 3. The heading to Section 392.0331, Local
3137 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
3238 Sec. 392.0331. APPOINTMENT OF TENANT REPRESENTATIVE OR
3339 CERTAIN OTHER RECIPIENTS OF HOUSING ASSISTANCE AS COMMISSIONER OF
3440 MUNICIPAL, COUNTY, OR REGIONAL HOUSING AUTHORITY.
3541 SECTION 4. Sections 392.0331(b), (b-1), (c), and (d), Local
3642 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
3743 (b) Except as provided by Subsection [Subsections] (b-1)
3844 [and (b-2)], in appointing commissioners under Section 392.031, a
3945 municipality with a municipal housing authority composed of five
4046 commissioners shall appoint at least one commissioner to the
4147 authority who is a tenant of a public housing project over which the
4248 authority has jurisdiction or who is a recipient of housing
4349 assistance administered through the authority's housing choice
4450 voucher program or project-based rental assistance program.
4551 In [Except as provided by Subsection (b-3), in] appointing
4652 commissioners under Section 392.031, a municipality with a
4753 municipal housing authority composed of seven or more commissioners
4854 shall appoint at least two commissioners to the authority who are
4955 tenants of a public housing project over which the authority has
5056 jurisdiction or who are recipients of housing assistance
5157 administered through the authority's housing choice voucher
5258 program or project-based rental assistance program.
5359 (b-1) The presiding officer of the governing body of a
5460 municipality that has a municipal housing authority in which the
5561 total number of units is 150 or fewer is not required to appoint a
5662 tenant or a recipient of housing assistance to the position of
5763 commissioner as otherwise required by Subsection (b) if the
5864 presiding officer has provided timely notice of a vacancy in the
5965 position to all eligible tenants or recipients of housing
6066 assistance and is unable to fill the position with an eligible
6167 tenant or recipient of housing assistance before the 60th day after
6268 the date the position becomes vacant.
6369 (c) In appointing commissioners under Section 392.032, a
6470 county shall appoint at least one commissioner to a county housing
6571 authority who is a tenant of a public housing project over which the
6672 county housing authority has jurisdiction or who is a recipient of
6773 housing assistance administered through the authority's housing
6874 choice voucher program or project-based rental assistance program.
6975 (d) In appointing commissioners under Section 392.033, a
7076 county or counties comprising a regional housing authority shall
7177 appoint at least one commissioner to a regional housing authority
7278 who is a tenant of a public housing project over which the regional
7379 housing authority has jurisdiction or who is a recipient of housing
7480 assistance administered through the authority's housing choice
7581 voucher program or project-based rental assistance program. If
7682 more than one county comprises a regional housing authority, the
7783 counties shall agree to a method for appointing to the regional
7884 housing authority the [tenant] member who is a tenant or a recipient
7985 of housing assistance [to the regional housing authority].
8086 SECTION 5. Sections 392.0331(b-2) and (b-3), Local
8187 Government Code, are repealed.
8288 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
83- ______________________________ ______________________________
84- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
85- I certify that H.B. No. 2529 was passed by the House on April
86- 18, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 2
87- present, not
88- voting.
89- ______________________________
90- Chief Clerk of the House
91- I certify that H.B. No. 2529 was passed by the Senate on
92- May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
93- ______________________________
94- Secretary of the Senate
95- APPROVED: _____________________
96- Date
97- _____________________
98- Governor
89+ * * * * *