Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2584 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Cortez (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 2584
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2584 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a code enforcement officer performing
 official duties to possess or carry an instrument used for
 deterring an animal bite.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 46.15, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  The provisions of Sections 46.02 and 46.03 prohibiting
 the possession or carrying of a club do not apply to a code
 enforcement officer who:
 (1)  holds a certificate of registration issued under
 Chapter 1952, Occupations Code; and
 (2)  possesses or carries an instrument used
 specifically for deterring an animal bite while the officer is:
 (A)  performing official duties; or
 (B)  traveling to or from a place of duty.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1952.051, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The education requirements adopted under Subsection (b)
 must include education regarding the principles and procedures to
 be followed when possessing or carrying an instrument used
 specifically for deterring an animal bite.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1952.1051, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1952.1051.  CONTINUING EDUCATION. The commission by
 rule shall prescribe continuing education requirements for code
 enforcement officers and code enforcement officers in training
 that:
 (1)  establish the number of hours of continuing
 education required for renewal of a certificate of registration;
 (2)  establish an approved curriculum that includes
 material regarding changes in applicable law and the principles and
 procedures to be followed when possessing or carrying an instrument
 used specifically for deterring an animal bite; and
 (3)  provide that the approved curriculum may be taught
 by suitable public agencies and by private entities approved by the
 department.
 SECTION 4.  (a) As soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act, the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation
 shall adopt the rules necessary to implement Sections 1952.051 and
 1952.1051, Occupations Code, as amended by this Act.
 (b)  A code enforcement officer shall complete the education
 requirements described by Section 1952.051(c), Occupations Code,
 as added by this Act, before the officer may possess or carry an
 instrument used specifically for deterring an animal bite as
 provided by Section 46.15(h), Penal Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *