1 | | - | H.B. No. 2584 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Cortez (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 2584 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
| 4 | + | Justice; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2584 By: Whitmire |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the authority of a code enforcement officer performing |
---|
6 | 14 | | official duties to possess or carry an instrument used for |
---|
7 | 15 | | deterring an animal bite. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 46.15, Penal Code, is amended by adding |
---|
10 | 18 | | Subsection (h) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | (h) The provisions of Sections 46.02 and 46.03 prohibiting |
---|
12 | 20 | | the possession or carrying of a club do not apply to a code |
---|
13 | 21 | | enforcement officer who: |
---|
14 | 22 | | (1) holds a certificate of registration issued under |
---|
15 | 23 | | Chapter 1952, Occupations Code; and |
---|
16 | 24 | | (2) possesses or carries an instrument used |
---|
17 | 25 | | specifically for deterring an animal bite while the officer is: |
---|
18 | 26 | | (A) performing official duties; or |
---|
19 | 27 | | (B) traveling to or from a place of duty. |
---|
20 | 28 | | SECTION 2. Section 1952.051, Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
21 | 29 | | by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
22 | 30 | | (c) The education requirements adopted under Subsection (b) |
---|
23 | 31 | | must include education regarding the principles and procedures to |
---|
24 | 32 | | be followed when possessing or carrying an instrument used |
---|
25 | 33 | | specifically for deterring an animal bite. |
---|
26 | 34 | | SECTION 3. Section 1952.1051, Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
27 | 35 | | to read as follows: |
---|
28 | 36 | | Sec. 1952.1051. CONTINUING EDUCATION. The commission by |
---|
29 | 37 | | rule shall prescribe continuing education requirements for code |
---|
30 | 38 | | enforcement officers and code enforcement officers in training |
---|
31 | 39 | | that: |
---|
32 | 40 | | (1) establish the number of hours of continuing |
---|
33 | 41 | | education required for renewal of a certificate of registration; |
---|
34 | 42 | | (2) establish an approved curriculum that includes |
---|
35 | 43 | | material regarding changes in applicable law and the principles and |
---|
36 | 44 | | procedures to be followed when possessing or carrying an instrument |
---|
37 | 45 | | used specifically for deterring an animal bite; and |
---|
38 | 46 | | (3) provide that the approved curriculum may be taught |
---|
39 | 47 | | by suitable public agencies and by private entities approved by the |
---|
40 | 48 | | department. |
---|
41 | 49 | | SECTION 4. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective |
---|
42 | 50 | | date of this Act, the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation |
---|
43 | 51 | | shall adopt the rules necessary to implement Sections 1952.051 and |
---|
44 | 52 | | 1952.1051, Occupations Code, as amended by this Act. |
---|
45 | 53 | | (b) A code enforcement officer shall complete the education |
---|
46 | 54 | | requirements described by Section 1952.051(c), Occupations Code, |
---|
47 | 55 | | as added by this Act, before the officer may possess or carry an |
---|
48 | 56 | | instrument used specifically for deterring an animal bite as |
---|
49 | 57 | | provided by Section 46.15(h), Penal Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
50 | 58 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
51 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
52 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
53 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2584 was passed by the House on May 7, |
---|
54 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
55 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
56 | | - | No. 2584 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 121, Nays 19, |
---|
57 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
58 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
60 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2584 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
61 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
62 | | - | 0. |
---|
63 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
65 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Date |
---|
67 | | - | __________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 59 | + | * * * * * |
---|