Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2586 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2019
Bill April 24, 2019