Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2587 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019