Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB259 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 259
1+By: Thompson of Brazoria, et al. H.B. No. 259
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Hancock)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
4+ April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Business & Commerce; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the
6+ following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to named driver insurance policies and certain related
613 exclusions.
714 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
815 SECTION 1. Chapter 1952, Insurance Code, is amended by
916 adding Subchapter H to read as follows:
1017 SUBCHAPTER H. NAMED DRIVER POLICIES
1118 Sec. 1952.351. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
1219 (1) "Household" means a unit composed of individuals
1320 living together in the same dwelling, without regard to whether
1421 they are related to each other. The term includes a unit composed
1522 of individuals living together in:
1623 (A) a home or mobile home;
1724 (B) a duplex unit, apartment unit, or condominium
1825 unit; or
1926 (C) any dwelling unit in a multiunit residential
2027 structure.
2128 (2) "Named driver exclusion" means a provision or
2229 endorsement of an automobile insurance policy that excludes
2330 specified drivers from coverage under the policy.
2431 (3) "Named driver policy" means an automobile
2532 insurance policy that provides any type of coverage for individuals
2633 named on the policy but that does not provide coverage for every
2734 individual who has permission to use a covered vehicle and who
2835 resides in a named insured's household.
2936 (4) "Operator's policy" means an automobile insurance
3037 policy that, in accordance with Section 601.077, Transportation
3138 Code, provides coverage for the named insured when operating an
3239 automobile the insured does not own.
3340 Sec. 1952.352. APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies to
3441 an insurer writing automobile insurance in this state, including an
3542 insurance company, corporation, reciprocal or interinsurance
3643 exchange, mutual insurance company, capital stock company,
3744 association, county mutual insurance company, Lloyd's plan, and any
3845 other insurer.
3946 Sec. 1952.353. NAMED DRIVER POLICIES PROHIBITED; CERTAIN
4047 NAMED DRIVER EXCLUSIONS AUTHORIZED. (a) An insurer may not
4148 deliver, issue for delivery, or renew a named driver policy unless
4249 the named driver policy is an operator's policy.
4350 (b) An insurer may use a named driver exclusion only if the
4451 exclusion specifically names each excluded driver and does not
4552 exclude a class of drivers and the named insured accepts the
4653 exclusion in writing.
4754 SECTION 2. Section 912.152(a), Insurance Code, is amended
4855 to read as follows:
4956 (a) A county mutual insurance company is subject to:
5057 (1) Sections 1952.051-1952.055;
5158 (2) Subchapter H, Chapter 1952;
5259 (3) [(2)] Subchapter B, Chapter 2002;
5360 (4) [(3)] Chapter 2301; and
5461 (5) [(4)] Articles 5.06 and 5.35.
5562 SECTION 3. Section 601.081(b), Transportation Code, is
5663 amended to read as follows:
5764 (b) A standard proof of motor vehicle liability insurance
5865 form prescribed by the Texas Department of Insurance must include:
5966 (1) the name of the insurer;
6067 (2) the insurance policy number;
6168 (3) the policy period;
6269 (4) the name and address of each insured;
6370 (5) the policy limits or a statement that the coverage
6471 of the policy complies with the minimum amounts of motor vehicle
6572 liability insurance required by this chapter; and
6673 (6) the make and model of each covered vehicle[; and
6774 [(7) for a named driver policy, the required
6875 disclosure under Section 1952.0545, Insurance Code].
6976 SECTION 4. Section 1952.0545, Insurance Code, and Section
7077 601.081(a), Transportation Code, are repealed.
7178 SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act applies only
7279 to an insurance policy that is delivered, issued for delivery, or
7380 renewed on or after January 1, 2020. A policy delivered, issued for
7481 delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2020, is governed by the law
7582 as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
7683 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
7784 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
78- ______________________________ ______________________________
79- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
80- I certify that H.B. No. 259 was passed by the House on April
81- 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 124, Nays 15, 1 present, not
82- voting.
83- ______________________________
84- Chief Clerk of the House
85- I certify that H.B. No. 259 was passed by the Senate on May
86- 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays 5, 1 present, not
87- voting.
88- ______________________________
89- Secretary of the Senate
90- APPROVED: _____________________
91- Date
92- _____________________
93- Governor
85+ * * * * *