Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2594 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019