Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2604 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Sanford (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 2604
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the number of emissions inspections performed by
 certain vehicle inspection stations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 548.3075(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A department rule that allows an [a qualified]
 inspection station to perform a limited emissions inspection of a
 motor vehicle may not restrict the number of limited emissions
 [station to fewer than 150] inspections conducted by the station
 [per month].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2020.
 * * * * *