|
06/10/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
06/10/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/26/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Record vote RV#923
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Amended 2-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Amended 1-Perez
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2019
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|