1 | | - | H.B. No. 2629 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Flynn, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2629 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 16, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 16, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the deadline to appeal administrative decisions of the |
---|
6 | 12 | | Teacher Retirement System of Texas. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 825, Government Code, is |
---|
9 | 15 | | amended by adding Section 825.521 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | Sec. 825.521. DEADLINE TO APPEAL FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE |
---|
11 | 17 | | DECISION. In adopting rules governing the appeal of a final |
---|
12 | 18 | | administrative decision of the retirement system, the board of |
---|
13 | 19 | | trustees shall ensure that rules establishing deadlines for the |
---|
14 | 20 | | filing of an appeal afford a member or retiree at least the same |
---|
15 | 21 | | amount of time to file an appeal as the retirement system has to |
---|
16 | 22 | | issue the retirement system's decision. |
---|
17 | 23 | | SECTION 2. As soon as practicable after the effective date |
---|
18 | 24 | | of this Act, the board of trustees of the Teacher Retirement System |
---|
19 | 25 | | of Texas shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section 825.521, |
---|
20 | 26 | | Government Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
21 | 27 | | SECTION 3. Rules adopted under Section 825.521, Government |
---|
22 | 28 | | Code, as added by this Act, may apply only to the appeal of an |
---|
23 | 29 | | administrative decision of an employee of the Teacher Retirement |
---|
24 | 30 | | System of Texas that is made on or after January 1, 2020. |
---|
25 | 31 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
26 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
27 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
28 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2629 was passed by the House on May 3, |
---|
29 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
30 | | - | voting. |
---|
31 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
32 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
33 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2629 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
34 | | - | 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
35 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
37 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Date |
---|
39 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
40 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 32 | + | * * * * * |
---|