Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2634 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: Flynn (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2634
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 9, 2019, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to municipal boundaries used to determine a cemetery
 location.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 711.008(e), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  For the purpose of determining where a cemetery may be
 located under Subsection (a), the boundary of an area annexed by a
 municipality is not considered to be a boundary of the municipality
 if:
 (1)  no more than 10 percent of the boundary of the
 annexed area is composed of a part of the boundary of the annexing
 municipality as it existed immediately before the annexation; or
 (2)  the annexed area cannot be developed as
 residential or commercial property and is primarily used for flood
 control.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *