Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2650 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2019
Bill April 15, 2019