Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2668 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Turner of Tarrant (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 2668
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2019;
 May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dissolution of a direct-support organization
 established by the Prepaid Higher Education Tuition Board and the
 transfer of funds related to prepaid higher education tuition
 scholarships to the Texas Match the Promise Foundation or a
 successor entity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.633, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (n) to read as follows:
 (n)  The comptroller may dissolve a direct-support
 organization established under Subsection (e) if the comptroller
 determines that the purpose of the organization has been
 substantially complied with and orders the dissolution.  On
 dissolution of the organization, title to all funds and property
 held by the organization is transferred to the Texas Match the
 Promise Foundation or a successor entity.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *