Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2687 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2019

                            86R13673 JON-D
 By: Reynolds H.B. No. 2687


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a task force to study the legal and
 societal barriers to equality for persons who are transgender.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section, "task force" means the
 transgender equality task force.
 (b)  The task force is established to study the legal and
 societal barriers to equality for persons in this state who are
 transgender.
 (c)  The task force is composed of:
 (1)  11 members appointed by the governor as follows:
 (A)  one representative of the Texas Department of
 Banking;
 (B)  one representative of the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice;
 (C)  one representative of the Department of
 Family and Protective Services;
 (D)  one representative of the Texas Department of
 Insurance;
 (E)  one representative of the Department of State
 Health Services;
 (F)  one representative of the Texas Education
 Agency;
 (G)  one representative of the Health and Human
 Services Commission;
 (H)  one representative of an institution of
 higher education;
 (I)  one representative of the Texas Workforce
 Commission civil rights division;
 (J)  one representative of the Texas Workforce
 Commission division of workforce development; and
 (K)  one representative of a nonprofit
 organization dedicated to civil rights;
 (2)  two members appointed by the lieutenant governor
 as follows:
 (A)  a parent or guardian of a person who is
 transgender; and
 (B)  an attorney who specializes in transgender
 rights; and
 (3)  two members appointed by the speaker of the house
 of representatives as follows:
 (A)  a physician who specializes in transgender
 health issues; and
 (B)  one person who is transgender.
 (d)  The task force shall hold its first meeting not later
 than October 1, 2019, and shall elect a presiding officer from among
 its membership.  The task force shall hold subsequent meetings at
 least quarterly at the call of the presiding officer.
 (e)  A task force member is not entitled to compensation for
 service on the task force but is entitled to reimbursement for
 actual and necessary expenses incurred in performing task force
 duties. The task force may accept gifts, grants, and donations to
 pay for those expenses.
 (f)  The Texas Workforce Commission civil rights division
 shall provide administrative support services at the request of the
 task force.
 (g)  The task force shall study how to ensure equality and
 improve the lives of persons who are transgender, with particular
 attention to the following areas:
 (1)  health care, including access to health care
 providers who are trained in transgender medical issues;
 (2)  long-term care for persons who are transgender and
 chronically ill or of advanced age;
 (3)  education;
 (4)  higher education;
 (5)  housing, including homelessness prevention and
 reduction;
 (6)  employment; and
 (7)  criminal justice, including the following:
 (A)  raising transgender awareness among law
 enforcement through training; and
 (B)  facilitating the appropriate placement of
 persons who are transgender in correctional facilities based on a
 person's gender identity.
 (h)  A state agency shall cooperate with and assist the task
 force in carrying out the duties of the task force.
 (i)  Not later than December 1, 2020, the task force shall
 prepare and submit to the governor and the legislature a written
 report that summarizes the task force's findings under this section
 and recommends solutions for advancing transgender equality and
 improving the lives of persons in this state who are transgender.
 (j)  The task force is abolished and this Act expires
 September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.