1 | | - | H.B. No. 2694 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2694 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Business & Commerce; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with |
---|
| 5 | + | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2694 By: Creighton |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the authority of certain insurers to make investments |
---|
6 | 14 | | in bond exchange-traded funds. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 424, Insurance Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended by adding Section 424.075 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 424.075. AUTHORIZED INVESTMENTS: BOND EXCHANGE-TRADED |
---|
11 | 19 | | FUNDS. (a) An insurer may invest the insurer's funds in excess of |
---|
12 | 20 | | minimum capital and surplus in shares of a bond exchange-traded |
---|
13 | 21 | | fund registered under the Investment Company Act of 1940 (15 U.S.C. |
---|
14 | 22 | | Section 80a-1 et seq.), as amended, if: |
---|
15 | 23 | | (1) the exchange-traded fund is solvent and reported |
---|
16 | 24 | | at least $100 million of net assets in the exchange-traded fund's |
---|
17 | 25 | | latest annual or more recent certified audited financial statement; |
---|
18 | 26 | | (2) the securities valuation office has designated the |
---|
19 | 27 | | exchange-traded fund as meeting the criteria to be placed on the |
---|
20 | 28 | | list promulgated by the securities valuation office of |
---|
24 | 32 | | (3) the amount of the insurer's investment in the |
---|
25 | 33 | | exchange-traded fund does not exceed 15 percent of the insurer's |
---|
26 | 34 | | capital and surplus. |
---|
27 | 35 | | (b) This section does not authorize an insurer to invest in |
---|
28 | 36 | | a bond exchange-traded fund that has: |
---|
29 | 37 | | (1) embedded structural features designed to deliver |
---|
30 | 38 | | performance that does not track the full unlevered and positive |
---|
31 | 39 | | return of the underlying index or exposure, including a leveraged |
---|
32 | 40 | | or inverse exchange-traded fund; or |
---|
33 | 41 | | (2) an expense ratio in excess of 100 basis points. |
---|
34 | 42 | | (c) An insurer may deposit with the department shares of a |
---|
35 | 43 | | bond exchange-traded fund described by Subsection (a) as a |
---|
36 | 44 | | statutory deposit if state law requires a statutory deposit from |
---|
37 | 45 | | the insurer. |
---|
38 | 46 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 425, Insurance Code, is |
---|
39 | 47 | | amended by adding Section 425.1231 to read as follows: |
---|
40 | 48 | | Sec. 425.1231. AUTHORIZED INVESTMENTS: BOND |
---|
41 | 49 | | EXCHANGE-TRADED FUNDS. (a) An insurance company may invest the |
---|
42 | 50 | | insurer's funds in excess of minimum capital and surplus in shares |
---|
43 | 51 | | of a bond exchange-traded fund registered under the Investment |
---|
44 | 52 | | Company Act of 1940 (15 U.S.C. Section 80a-1 et seq.), as amended, |
---|
45 | 53 | | if: |
---|
46 | 54 | | (1) the exchange-traded fund is solvent and reported |
---|
47 | 55 | | at least $100 million of net assets in the exchange-traded fund's |
---|
48 | 56 | | latest annual or more recent certified audited financial statement; |
---|
49 | 57 | | (2) the securities valuation office has designated the |
---|
50 | 58 | | exchange-traded fund as meeting the criteria to be placed on the |
---|
51 | 59 | | list promulgated by the securities valuation office of |
---|
55 | 63 | | (3) the amount of the insurance company's investment |
---|
56 | 64 | | in the exchange-traded fund does not exceed 15 percent of the |
---|
57 | 65 | | insurance company's capital and surplus. |
---|
58 | 66 | | (b) This section does not authorize an insurance company to |
---|
59 | 67 | | invest in a bond exchange-traded fund that has: |
---|
60 | 68 | | (1) embedded structural features designed to deliver |
---|
61 | 69 | | performance that does not track the full unlevered and positive |
---|
62 | 70 | | return of the underlying index or exposure, including a leveraged |
---|
63 | 71 | | or inverse exchange-traded fund; or |
---|
64 | 72 | | (2) an expense ratio in excess of 100 basis points. |
---|
65 | 73 | | (c) A bond exchange-traded fund described by Subsection (a) |
---|
66 | 74 | | shall be considered a business entity for purposes of Section |
---|
67 | 75 | | 425.110. |
---|
68 | 76 | | (d) An insurance company may deposit with the department |
---|
69 | 77 | | shares of a bond exchange-traded fund described by Subsection (a) |
---|
70 | 78 | | as a statutory deposit if state law requires a statutory deposit |
---|
71 | 79 | | from the insurance company. |
---|
72 | | - | SECTION 3. |
---|
73 | | - | Subchapter D, Chapter 425, Insurance Code, is |
---|
74 | | - | amended by adding Section 425.2061 to read as follows: |
---|
75 | | - | Sec. 425.2061. AUTHORIZED INVESTMENTS FOR ALL FUNDS: BOND |
---|
76 | | - | EXCHANGE-TRADED FUNDS. Subject to Section 425.157(b), an insurer |
---|
77 | | - | may invest any of the insurer's funds and accumulations in a bond |
---|
78 | | - | exchange-traded fund described by Section 425.1231(a). |
---|
79 | | - | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
80 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
81 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
82 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2694 was passed by the House on April |
---|
83 | | - | 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
84 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
85 | | - | No. 2694 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, |
---|
86 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
87 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
88 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
89 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2694 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
90 | | - | amendments, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
91 | | - | 0. |
---|
92 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
93 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
94 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
95 | | - | Date |
---|
96 | | - | __________________ |
---|
97 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 80 | + | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
| 81 | + | * * * * * |
---|