Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2714 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019