1 | | - | H.B. No. 2718 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Turner of Tarrant (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 2718 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2718 By: Powell |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to authorizing an increase in the student union fee at The |
---|
6 | 14 | | University of Texas at Arlington. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 54.529(a), Education Code, is amended to |
---|
9 | 17 | | read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (a) The board of regents of The University of Texas System |
---|
11 | 19 | | may levy a student union fee not to exceed $150 [$39] per student |
---|
12 | 20 | | for each regular semester and not to exceed $75 [$19.50] per student |
---|
13 | 21 | | for each term of the summer session, for the sole purpose of |
---|
14 | 22 | | financing, constructing, operating, maintaining, and improving the |
---|
15 | 23 | | Student Union Building for The University of Texas at Arlington. |
---|
16 | 24 | | The [; provided, however, that the] fee may not be increased above |
---|
17 | 25 | | an amount previously levied [$15 per student for each regular |
---|
18 | 26 | | semester and $7.50 per student for each term of the summer session] |
---|
19 | 27 | | unless the increase is approved by a majority vote of those students |
---|
20 | 28 | | participating in a general election held at the university for that |
---|
21 | 29 | | purpose. The ballot proposition for such an election must clearly |
---|
22 | 30 | | state the amount of the proposed fee increase and describe the |
---|
23 | 31 | | reason for the proposed fee increase. The fees herein authorized to |
---|
24 | 32 | | be levied are in addition to any use or service fee now or hereafter |
---|
25 | 33 | | authorized to be levied. |
---|
26 | 34 | | SECTION 2. Section 54.529(a), Education Code, as amended by |
---|
27 | 35 | | this Act, applies beginning with fees imposed for the 2019 fall |
---|
28 | 36 | | semester. |
---|
29 | 37 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
30 | 38 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
31 | 39 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
32 | 40 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
33 | 41 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
36 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2718 was passed by the House on May 3, |
---|
37 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 107, Nays 33, 2 present, not |
---|
38 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
39 | | - | No. 2718 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 88, Nays 51, |
---|
40 | | - | 3 present, not voting. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
43 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2718 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
44 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays |
---|
45 | | - | 5. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
48 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Date |
---|
50 | | - | __________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 42 | + | * * * * * |
---|