Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Record vote RV#754
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Record vote RV#680
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amended 1-S. Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2019
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2019
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2018
|
Filed
|
|
|