House
|
05/10/2019
|
Record vote RV#1341
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Motion fails
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Motion to suspend rules and reconsider
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Record vote RV#1165
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Failed to pass
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-White
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Record vote RV#1138
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Amended 1-White
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 3-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Amended 2-Pacheco
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2019
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|