1 | | - | H.B. No. 2757 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Leach (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 2757 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 15, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2757 By: Zaffirini |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the rule of decision in a court of this state. |
---|
6 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 5.001, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, |
---|
8 | 16 | | is amended to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 17 | | Sec. 5.001. RULE OF DECISION. (a) The rule of decision in |
---|
10 | 18 | | this state consists of those portions of the common law of England |
---|
11 | 19 | | that are not inconsistent with the constitution or the laws of this |
---|
12 | 20 | | state, the constitution of this state, and the laws of this state. |
---|
13 | 21 | | (b) In any action governed by the laws of this state |
---|
14 | 22 | | concerning rights and obligations under the law, the American Law |
---|
15 | 23 | | Institute's Restatements of the Law are not controlling. |
---|
16 | 24 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
17 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
18 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
19 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2757 was passed by the House on April |
---|
20 | | - | 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 3, 1 present, not |
---|
21 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
22 | | - | No. 2757 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 1, |
---|
23 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
24 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
25 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
26 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2757 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
27 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
28 | | - | 0. |
---|
29 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
30 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
31 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
32 | | - | Date |
---|
33 | | - | __________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 25 | + | * * * * * |
---|