Senate | 05/07/2019 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Record vote RV#993 | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Postponed 5/2/19 4:00 PM | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/28/2019 | Filed |