1 | | - | H.B. No. 277 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Oliverson, et al. H.B. No. 277 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House March 21, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | March 27, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher |
---|
| 5 | + | Education; May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 6 | + | Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 12 | | relating to a requirement that online admission application forms |
---|
6 | 13 | | for public institutions of higher education include a link to |
---|
7 | 14 | | certain comparative gainful employment data. |
---|
8 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 51.762, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
10 | 17 | | adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 18 | | (b-1) An electronic common admission application form |
---|
12 | 19 | | adopted under this section must include a prominent link to |
---|
13 | 20 | | comparative gainful employment data regarding institutions of |
---|
14 | 21 | | higher education, including information described by Section |
---|
15 | 22 | | 7.040, on a website maintained by the board using data compiled by |
---|
16 | 23 | | the board in coordination with the Texas Workforce Commission. |
---|
17 | 24 | | SECTION 2. Section 51.763(b), Education Code, is amended to |
---|
18 | 25 | | read as follows: |
---|
19 | 26 | | (b) The form must: |
---|
20 | 27 | | (1) [shall] allow each applicant to: |
---|
21 | 28 | | (A) [(1)] apply electronically to one or more of |
---|
22 | 29 | | the general academic teaching institutions within the university |
---|
23 | 30 | | system; and |
---|
24 | 31 | | (B) [(2)] indicate preferences for admission |
---|
25 | 32 | | between those institutions; and |
---|
26 | 33 | | (2) include a prominent link to comparative gainful |
---|
27 | 34 | | employment data regarding institutions of higher education, |
---|
28 | 35 | | including information described by Section 7.040, on a website |
---|
29 | 36 | | maintained by the board using data compiled by the board in |
---|
30 | 37 | | coordination with the Texas Workforce Commission. |
---|
31 | 38 | | SECTION 3. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board |
---|
32 | 39 | | and the governing board of a university system shall comply with |
---|
33 | 40 | | Section 51.762(b-1) or 51.763(b)(2), Education Code, as added by |
---|
34 | 41 | | this Act, as applicable, as soon as practicable following the |
---|
35 | 42 | | effective date of this Act but not later than January 1, 2020. |
---|
36 | 43 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
37 | 44 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
38 | 45 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
39 | 46 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
40 | 47 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
43 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 277 was passed by the House on March |
---|
44 | | - | 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
45 | | - | voting. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
48 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 277 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
49 | | - | 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
50 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
52 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Date |
---|
54 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 48 | + | * * * * * |
---|