1 | | - | H.B. No. 2775 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Krause (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2775 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Transportation; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 9, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2775 By: Hancock |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the movement of pedestrians in front of, under, |
---|
6 | 14 | | between, or through rail cars at a railroad grade crossing. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 552, Transportation Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 17 | | adding Section 552.011 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 552.011. TRAIN OCCUPYING CROSSING. A pedestrian may |
---|
11 | 19 | | not move in front of, under, between, or through the cars of a |
---|
12 | 20 | | moving or stationary train occupying any part of a railroad grade |
---|
13 | 21 | | crossing. |
---|
14 | 22 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
15 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
16 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
17 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2775 was passed by the House on April |
---|
18 | | - | 18, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 7, 1 present, not |
---|
19 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
20 | | - | No. 2775 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 121, Nays 22, |
---|
21 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
22 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
23 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
24 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2775 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
25 | | - | amendments, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
26 | | - | 0. |
---|
27 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
28 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
29 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
30 | | - | Date |
---|
31 | | - | __________________ |
---|
32 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 23 | + | * * * * * |
---|