Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB278 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2019
Bill March 28, 2019