Senate | 05/06/2019 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/04/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Record vote RV#987 | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Amended 2-Buckley and Springer | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Amended 1-Zwiener | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Postponed 5/2/19 3:45 PM | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | ||
House | 02/28/2019 | Filed |