Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB279 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 279
1+By: Craddick (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 279
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
3+ April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4+ Human Services; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to authorizing the Midland County Hospital District of
612 Midland County, Texas, to impose a sales and use tax.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Chapter 1061, Special District Local Laws Code,
915 is amended by adding Subchapter G to read as follows:
1016 SUBCHAPTER G. SALES AND USE TAX
1117 Sec. 1061.301. TAX AUTHORIZED. (a) The district may adopt,
1218 change the rate of, or abolish a sales and use tax at an election
1319 held in the district.
1420 (b) The district may not adopt a tax under this subchapter
1521 or increase the rate of the tax if as a result of the adoption of the
1622 tax or the tax increase the combined rate of all sales and use taxes
1723 imposed by the district and all other political subdivisions of
1824 this state having territory in the district would exceed two
1925 percent in any location in the district.
2026 Sec. 1061.302. APPLICABILITY OF OTHER LAW. Except to the
2127 extent that a provision of this subchapter applies, Chapter 323,
2228 Tax Code, applies to a tax authorized by this subchapter in the same
2329 manner as that chapter applies to the tax authorized by that
2430 chapter.
2531 Sec. 1061.303. TAX RATE; CHANGE IN RATE. (a) The district
2632 may impose a tax authorized by this subchapter in increments of
2733 one-eighth of one percent, with a minimum rate of one-eighth of one
2834 percent and a maximum rate of two percent.
2935 (b) The district may increase the rate of a tax authorized
3036 by this subchapter to a maximum of two percent or decrease the rate
3137 of the tax to a minimum of one-eighth of one percent if the change is
3238 approved by a majority of the voters of the district at an election
3339 called for that purpose.
3440 Sec. 1061.304. ELECTION PROCEDURE. An election to adopt,
3541 change the rate of, or abolish a tax authorized by this subchapter
3642 is called by the adoption of an order of the board. The board may
3743 call an election on its own motion and shall call an election if a
3844 number of qualified voters in the district equal to at least five
3945 percent of the number of registered voters in the district
4046 petitions the board to call the election.
4147 Sec. 1061.305. ELECTION IN OTHER TAXING AUTHORITY. (a) In
4248 this section, "taxing authority" means any entity authorized to
4349 impose a local sales and use tax.
4450 (b) If the district is included within the boundaries of
4551 another taxing authority and the adoption or increase in the rate of
4652 a tax under this subchapter would result in a combined tax rate by
4753 the district and other political subdivisions of this state of more
4854 than two percent at any location in the district, an election to
4955 approve or increase the rate of the tax has no effect unless:
5056 (1) one or more of the other taxing authorities holds
5157 an election in accordance with the law governing that authority on
5258 the same date as the election under this subchapter to reduce the
5359 tax rate of that authority to a rate that will result in a combined
5460 tax rate by the district and other political subdivisions of not
5561 more than two percent at any location in the district; and
5662 (2) the combined tax rate is reduced to not more than
5763 two percent as a result of that election.
5864 (c) This section does not permit a taxing authority to
5965 impose taxes at differential tax rates within the territory of the
6066 authority.
6167 Sec. 1061.306. TAX EFFECTIVE DATE. (a) The adoption,
6268 change in the rate of, or abolition of a tax under this subchapter
6369 takes effect on the first day of the first calendar quarter
6470 occurring after the expiration of the first complete calendar
6571 quarter occurring after the date on which the comptroller receives
6672 notice of the results of an election to adopt, change the rate of,
6773 or abolish the tax.
6874 (b) If the comptroller determines that an effective date
6975 provided by Subsection (a) will occur before the comptroller can
7076 reasonably take the action required to begin collecting the tax or
7177 to implement the change in the rate of the tax or the abolition of
7278 the tax, the effective date may be extended by the comptroller until
7379 the first day of the next calendar quarter.
7480 Sec. 1061.307. USE OF TAX REVENUE. Revenue from a tax
7581 imposed under this subchapter may be used by the district for any
7682 purpose of the district authorized by law.
7783 SECTION 2. Section 1061.151(b), Special District Local Laws
7884 Code, is amended to read as follows:
7985 (b) The proposed budget must contain a complete financial
8086 statement of:
8187 (1) the outstanding obligations of the district;
8288 (2) the cash on hand in each district fund;
8389 (3) the money received by the district from all
8490 sources during the previous year;
8591 (4) the money available to the district from all
8692 sources during the ensuing year;
8793 (5) the balances expected at the end of the year in
8894 which the budget is being prepared;
8995 (6) the estimated revenue and balances available to
9096 cover the proposed budget;
9197 (7) the estimated ad valorem tax rate required; and
9298 (8) the proposed expenditures and disbursements and
9399 the estimated receipts and collections for the following fiscal
94100 year.
95101 SECTION 3. The heading to Subchapter F, Chapter 1061,
96102 Special District Local Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
97103 SUBCHAPTER F. AD VALOREM TAXES
98104 SECTION 4. Section 26.012(1), Tax Code, is amended to read
99105 as follows:
100106 (1) "Additional sales and use tax" means an additional
101107 sales and use tax imposed by:
102108 (A) a city under Section 321.101(b);
103109 (B) a county under Chapter 323; or
104110 (C) a hospital district, other than a hospital
105111 district:
106112 (i) created on or after September 1, 2001,
107113 that:
108114 (a) [(i)] imposes the sales and use
109115 tax under Subchapter I, Chapter 286, Health and Safety Code; or
110116 (b) [(ii)] imposes the sales and use
111117 tax under Subchapter L, Chapter 285, Health and Safety Code; or
112118 (ii) that imposes the sales and use tax
113119 under Subchapter G, Chapter 1061, Special District Local Laws Code.
114120 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
115121 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
116122 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
117123 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
118124 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
119- ______________________________ ______________________________
120- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
121- I certify that H.B. No. 279 was passed by the House on April
122- 12, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 11, 2 present, not
123- voting.
124- ______________________________
125- Chief Clerk of the House
126- I certify that H.B. No. 279 was passed by the Senate on May
127- 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4.
128- ______________________________
129- Secretary of the Senate
130- APPROVED: _____________________
131- Date
132- _____________________
133- Governor
125+ * * * * *