Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2805 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2805
1+By: Darby (Senate Sponsor - Flores) H.B. No. 2805
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
3+ April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
4+ Rural Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to regulations for taking marl, sand, gravel, shell, or
612 mudshell.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Section 86.003, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
915 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
1016 (c) The commission shall prescribe a single application
1117 form for an individual or general permit. The form must require
1218 individual and general permit applicants to provide the same
1319 information, including information regarding:
1420 (1) the publication of notice in:
1521 (A) the daily or weekly newspaper with the
1622 greatest circulation in the county or counties affected by the
1723 issuance of the permit for three consecutive days, if daily; and
1824 (B) one newspaper published for the community
1925 closest to the proposed area of disturbance, if any;
2026 (2) proof that notice was sent by certified mail to
2127 alongshore property owners of property one river mile above and
2228 below the proposed area of disturbance described in the permit;
2329 (3) a sedimentation impact assessment approved by the
2430 department; and
2531 (4) any amendments to the permit, if the application
2632 is for the renewal of a permit.
2733 SECTION 2. Section 86.006, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
2834 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
2935 (d) A general permit issued under this chapter has a maximum
3036 term length of one year.
3137 SECTION 3. Chapter 86, Parks and Wildlife Code, is amended
3238 by adding Section 86.0105 to read as follows:
3339 Sec. 86.0105. REMOVAL REPORT. A person holding a permit
3440 issued under this chapter shall deliver to the department a report
3541 stating how much marl, sand, gravel, shell, or mudshell was removed
3642 during the term of the permit. The commission shall adopt rules
3743 regarding the delivery and format of the report.
3844 SECTION 4. Section 86.021, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
3945 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
4046 (b-1) In this subsection, "unconsolidated sedimentary
4147 material" means loose gravel, sand, or other sedimentary material
4248 that has been transported by the flow of the watercourse. The term
4349 does not include solid bedrock or earthen banks. A project results
4450 in an insignificant taking or disturbance of marl, sand, gravel,
4551 shell, or mudshell for purposes of Subsection (b)(1) if:
4652 (1) the project is noncommercial;
4753 (2) the project takes or disturbs less than 125 cubic
4854 yards of dry unconsolidated sedimentary material within a 12-month
4955 period;
5056 (3) the project occurs within an on-channel
5157 impoundment created by a dam originally constructed on or before
5258 December 31, 1955, and the dam crest has not been increased in
5359 height by more than six inches since initial construction; and
5460 (4) the taking or disturbance of unconsolidated
5561 sedimentary material does not occur outside of the impoundment in
5662 areas above dam crest elevation.
5763 SECTION 5. (a) Section 86.003(c), Parks and Wildlife Code,
5864 as added by this Act, applies only to a permit application for the
5965 taking of marl, sand, gravel, shell, or mudshell that is filed with
6066 the Parks and Wildlife Department on or after the effective date of
6167 this Act. A permit application for the taking of marl, sand,
6268 gravel, shell, or mudshell filed before the effective date of this
6369 Act is governed by the law in effect when the permit application was
6470 filed, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
6571 (b) Sections 86.006(d) and 86.0105, Parks and Wildlife
6672 Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a permit for the taking of
6773 marl, sand, gravel, shell, or mudshell issued on or after the
6874 effective date of this Act. A permit for the taking of marl, sand,
6975 gravel, shell, or mudshell issued before the effective date of this
7076 Act is governed by the law in effect when the permit was issued, and
7177 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
7278 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
73- ______________________________ ______________________________
74- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
75- I certify that H.B. No. 2805 was passed by the House on April
76- 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 2, 2 present, not
77- voting.
78- ______________________________
79- Chief Clerk of the House
80- I certify that H.B. No. 2805 was passed by the Senate on May
81- 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
82- ______________________________
83- Secretary of the Senate
84- APPROVED: _____________________
85- Date
86- _____________________
87- Governor
79+ * * * * *