Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2809 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Middleton (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2809
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of State Highway 99 in Chambers County
 as the Deputy Sheriff Shane Detwiler Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.152 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.152.  DEPUTY SHERIFF SHANE DETWILER MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY. (a)  The portion of State Highway 99 in Chambers County
 between its intersection with Interstate Highway 10 and the Harris
 County line is designated as the Deputy Sheriff Shane Detwiler
 Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Deputy Sheriff Shane Detwiler Memorial Highway
 and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *