Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2816 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2816
1+By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2816
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019;
3+ May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
4+ Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to compensation and leave for certain employees of the
612 fraud unit of the Texas Department of Insurance.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Section 659.301(5), Government Code, is amended
915 to read as follows:
1016 (5) "State employee" means an individual who:
1117 (A) is a commissioned law enforcement officer of
1218 the Department of Public Safety, the Texas Facilities Commission,
1319 the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission, the Texas Department of
1420 Criminal Justice, [or] the attorney general, or the insurance fraud
1521 unit of the Texas Department of Insurance;
1622 (B) is a commissioned security officer of the
1723 comptroller;
1824 (C) is a law enforcement officer commissioned by
1925 the Parks and Wildlife Commission;
2026 (D) is a commissioned peace officer of an
2127 institution of higher education;
2228 (E) is an employee or official of the Board of
2329 Pardons and Paroles or the parole division of the Texas Department
2430 of Criminal Justice if the employee or official has routine direct
2531 contact with inmates of any penal or correctional institution or
2632 with administratively released prisoners subject to the board's
2733 jurisdiction;
2834 (F) has been certified to the Employees
2935 Retirement System of Texas under Section 815.505 as having begun
3036 employment as a law enforcement officer or custodial officer,
3137 unless the individual has been certified to the system as having
3238 ceased employment as a law enforcement officer or custodial
3339 officer; or
3440 (G) before May 29, 1987, received hazardous duty
3541 pay based on the terms of any state law if the individual holds a
3642 position designated under that law as eligible for the pay.
3743 SECTION 2. Section 661.918(a), Government Code, is amended
3844 to read as follows:
3945 (a) This section applies to a peace officer under Article
4046 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, who is commissioned as a law
4147 enforcement officer or agent, including a ranger, by:
4248 (1) the Public Safety Commission and the director of
4349 the Department of Public Safety;
4450 (2) the Parks and Wildlife Commission;
4551 (3) the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission; [or]
4652 (4) the attorney general; or
4753 (5) the insurance fraud unit of the Texas Department
4854 of Insurance.
4955 SECTION 3. Section 701.104, Insurance Code, is amended by
5056 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
5157 (d) The commissioner shall ensure that a peace officer
5258 commissioned under Subsection (a) is compensated according to
5359 Schedule C of the position classification salary schedule
5460 prescribed by the General Appropriations Act.
5561 SECTION 4. (a) The classification officer in the office of
5662 the state auditor shall classify the position of commissioned peace
5763 officer employed by the insurance fraud unit of the Texas
5864 Department of Insurance as a Schedule C position under the Texas
5965 Position Classification Plan.
6066 (b) The change made by the classification officer as
6167 required by this section applies beginning with the state fiscal
6268 biennium beginning September 1, 2019.
6369 (c) This section expires September 1, 2021.
6470 SECTION 5. Section 661.918(a), Government Code, as amended
6571 by this Act, applies only to an injury that occurs on or after the
6672 effective date of this Act.
6773 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
68- ______________________________ ______________________________
69- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
70- I certify that H.B. No. 2816 was passed by the House on May 7,
71- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 5, 2 present, not
72- voting.
73- ______________________________
74- Chief Clerk of the House
75- I certify that H.B. No. 2816 was passed by the Senate on May
76- 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
77- ______________________________
78- Secretary of the Senate
79- APPROVED: _____________________
80- Date
81- _____________________
82- Governor
74+ * * * * *