Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2840 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019