1 | | - | H.B. No. 2846 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Larson, et al. H.B. No. 2846 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Huffman, Birdwell, Taylor) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water & |
---|
| 5 | + | Rural Affairs; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 6 | + | vote: Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 12 | | relating to the sale of the Allens Creek Reservoir project. |
---|
6 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Article 1, Chapter 1291, Acts of the 76th |
---|
8 | 15 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is amended by adding Section |
---|
9 | 16 | | 1.07 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 17 | | Sec. 1.07. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of this |
---|
11 | 18 | | article, not later than January 1, 2020, the City of Houston shall |
---|
12 | 19 | | enter into a contractual agreement with the Brazos River Authority |
---|
13 | 20 | | to transfer to the Brazos River Authority all of the city's |
---|
14 | 21 | | ownership interests in the Allens Creek Reservoir project, |
---|
15 | 22 | | including all required water right permits, along with the |
---|
16 | 23 | | responsibility to construct the project in accordance with all |
---|
17 | 24 | | associated statutory requirements and deadlines. |
---|
18 | 25 | | (b) Construction of the reservoir is subject to the Brazos |
---|
19 | 26 | | River Authority obtaining all necessary federal permits. |
---|
20 | 27 | | (c) In addition to other necessary provisions, the |
---|
21 | 28 | | contractual agreement described by Subsection (a) must include |
---|
22 | 29 | | provisions for the transfer of an amount not to exceed $23 million |
---|
23 | 30 | | from the Brazos River Authority to the City of Houston. |
---|
24 | 31 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
25 | 32 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
26 | 33 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
27 | 34 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
28 | 35 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
29 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
30 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
31 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2846 was passed by the House on April |
---|
32 | | - | 9, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 5, 1 present, not |
---|
33 | | - | voting. |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
36 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2846 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
37 | | - | 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3. |
---|
38 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
40 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Date |
---|
42 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 36 | + | * * * * * |
---|