1 | | - | H.B. No. 2856 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Morrison (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2856 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 6, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2856 By: Nichols |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to restrictions under disaster remediation contracts; |
---|
6 | 14 | | creating a criminal offense. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Sections 58.001(1) and (2), Business & Commerce |
---|
9 | 17 | | Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (1) "Disaster remediation" means the removal, |
---|
11 | 19 | | cleaning, sanitizing, demolition, reconstruction, or other |
---|
12 | 20 | | treatment of existing improvements to real property performed |
---|
13 | 21 | | because of damage or destruction to that property caused by a |
---|
14 | 22 | | natural disaster. |
---|
15 | 23 | | (2) "Disaster remediation contractor" means a person |
---|
16 | 24 | | who engages in disaster remediation for compensation, other than a |
---|
17 | 25 | | person who has a permit, license, registration, or other |
---|
18 | 26 | | authorization from the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality |
---|
19 | 27 | | for the collection, transportation, treatment, storage, |
---|
20 | 28 | | processing, or disposal of solid waste, but does not include an |
---|
21 | 29 | | entity approved by the Internal Revenue Service as tax exempt under |
---|
22 | 30 | | Section 501(c)(3), Internal Revenue Code of 1986. |
---|
23 | 31 | | SECTION 2. Section 58.004, Business & Commerce Code, is |
---|
24 | 32 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
25 | 33 | | Sec. 58.004. PENALTIES [DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICE]. (a) A |
---|
26 | 34 | | violation of this chapter by a disaster remediation contractor is a |
---|
27 | 35 | | false, misleading, or deceptive act or practice as defined by |
---|
28 | 36 | | Section 17.46(b), and any remedy under Subchapter E, Chapter 17, is |
---|
29 | 37 | | available for a violation of this chapter. |
---|
30 | 38 | | (b) A disaster remediation contractor who violates Section |
---|
31 | 39 | | 58.003(b)(1) or (2) commits an offense. An offense under this |
---|
32 | 40 | | section is: |
---|
33 | 41 | | (1) a Class B misdemeanor if the offense was committed |
---|
34 | 42 | | without the intent to defraud the person contracting for disaster |
---|
35 | 43 | | remediation services; or |
---|
36 | 44 | | (2) a felony of the third degree if the offense was |
---|
37 | 45 | | committed with the intent to defraud the person contracting for |
---|
38 | 46 | | disaster remediation services. |
---|
39 | 47 | | (c) It is a defense to prosecution under this section if the |
---|
40 | 48 | | disaster remediation contractor refunds any payment made in |
---|
41 | 49 | | violation of Section 58.003(b)(1) or (2) not later than the 15th day |
---|
42 | 50 | | following the receipt of a written demand alleging a violation of |
---|
43 | 51 | | Section 58.003(b)(1) or (2) sent by certified mail to the disaster |
---|
44 | 52 | | remediation contractor's last known business address or the address |
---|
45 | 53 | | of the disaster remediation contractor's registered agent. |
---|
46 | 54 | | SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to |
---|
47 | 55 | | a disaster remediation contract entered into on or after the |
---|
48 | 56 | | effective date of this Act. A disaster remediation contract |
---|
49 | 57 | | entered into before the effective date of this Act is governed by |
---|
50 | 58 | | the law in effect when the contract was entered into, and the former |
---|
51 | 59 | | law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
52 | 60 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
55 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2856 was passed by the House on May 3, |
---|
56 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 6, 2 present, not |
---|
57 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
58 | | - | No. 2856 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 5, |
---|
59 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
60 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
61 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
62 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2856 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
63 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
64 | | - | 0. |
---|
65 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
67 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Date |
---|
69 | | - | __________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 61 | + | * * * * * |
---|