House | 05/06/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Filed |