1 | | - | H.B. No. 293 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: King of Hemphill, et al. H.B. No. 293 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 8, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 5 | + | Intergovernmental Relations; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with |
---|
| 6 | + | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, |
---|
| 7 | + | Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 293 By: Alvarado |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to investment training requirements for school district |
---|
6 | 15 | | financial officers. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 2256.008, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 18 | | amending Subsection (a-1) and adding Subsection (g) to read as |
---|
10 | 19 | | follows: |
---|
11 | 20 | | (a-1) Except as provided by Subsection (g) [In addition to |
---|
12 | 21 | | the requirements of Subsection (a)(1)], the treasurer, or the chief |
---|
13 | 22 | | financial officer if the treasurer is not the chief financial |
---|
14 | 23 | | officer, and the investment officer of a school district or a |
---|
15 | 24 | | municipality, in addition to the requirements of Subsection (a)(1), |
---|
16 | 25 | | shall attend an investment training session not less than once in a |
---|
17 | 26 | | two-year period that begins on the first day of the school |
---|
18 | 27 | | district's or municipality's fiscal year and consists of the two |
---|
19 | 28 | | consecutive fiscal years after that date, and receive not less than |
---|
20 | 29 | | eight hours of instruction relating to investment responsibilities |
---|
21 | 30 | | under this subchapter from an independent source approved by the |
---|
22 | 31 | | governing body of the school district or municipality, or by a |
---|
23 | 32 | | designated investment committee advising the investment officer as |
---|
24 | 33 | | provided for in the investment policy of the school district or |
---|
25 | 34 | | municipality. |
---|
26 | 35 | | (g) Subsection (a-1) does not apply to the treasurer, chief |
---|
27 | 36 | | financial officer, or investment officer of a school district if: |
---|
28 | 37 | | (1) the district: |
---|
29 | 38 | | (A) does not invest district funds; or |
---|
30 | 39 | | (B) only deposits those funds in: |
---|
31 | 40 | | (i) interest-bearing deposit accounts; or |
---|
32 | 41 | | (ii) certificates of deposit as authorized |
---|
33 | 42 | | by Section 2256.010; and |
---|
34 | 43 | | (2) the treasurer, chief financial officer, or |
---|
35 | 44 | | investment officer annually submits to the agency a sworn affidavit |
---|
36 | 45 | | identifying the applicable criteria under Subdivision (1) that |
---|
37 | 46 | | apply to the district. |
---|
38 | 47 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
39 | 48 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
40 | 49 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
41 | 50 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
42 | 51 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
45 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 293 was passed by the House on April |
---|
46 | | - | 5, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
47 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
48 | | - | No. 293 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 1 |
---|
49 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
50 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
52 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 293 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
53 | | - | amendments, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
54 | | - | 0. |
---|
55 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
56 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
57 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
58 | | - | Date |
---|
59 | | - | __________________ |
---|
60 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 52 | + | * * * * * |
---|