1 | 1 | | 86R12309 MP-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Zwiener H.B. No. 2934 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the assessment of public school students in writing |
---|
8 | 8 | | under an alternative method. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 39.023, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
11 | 11 | | adding Subsection (a-14) to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (a-14) An assessment instrument administered to students in |
---|
13 | 13 | | grade four to assess skills in writing is not subject to Subsections |
---|
14 | 14 | | (a-12) and (a-13). |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 2. Sections 39.02301(b), (f), (h), and (j), |
---|
16 | 16 | | Education Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (b) During the 2020-2021 [2016-2017] and 2021-2022 |
---|
18 | 18 | | [2017-2018] school years, the agency shall operate [establish] a |
---|
19 | 19 | | pilot program as provided by this section to implement in |
---|
20 | 20 | | designated school districts the writing assessment method |
---|
21 | 21 | | developed under Subsection (a). |
---|
22 | 22 | | (f) The agency, in consultation with teachers, shall |
---|
23 | 23 | | develop a rubric for scoring student writing assessments under the |
---|
24 | 24 | | pilot program. The individuals responsible for scoring student |
---|
25 | 25 | | writing assessments [under the pilot program] shall be coordinated |
---|
26 | 26 | | [jointly] by the agency with joint participation of: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) the school district in which the student is |
---|
28 | 28 | | enrolled and that is participating in the pilot program; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (2) a public junior college or institution of higher |
---|
30 | 30 | | education that enters into an agreement with the participating |
---|
31 | 31 | | school district; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (3) the regional education service center that serves |
---|
33 | 33 | | the participating district. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (h) [Not later than September 1, 2016, the agency shall |
---|
35 | 35 | | prepare and deliver to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the |
---|
36 | 36 | | speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer |
---|
37 | 37 | | of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction |
---|
38 | 38 | | over primary and secondary education a report covering the study of |
---|
39 | 39 | | the development of the writing assessment method under Subsection |
---|
40 | 40 | | (a).] Not later than September 1, 2021, and September 1, 2022 [of |
---|
41 | 41 | | each year in 2017 and 2018], the agency shall prepare and deliver to |
---|
42 | 42 | | the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of |
---|
43 | 43 | | representatives, and the presiding officer of each legislative |
---|
44 | 44 | | standing committee with primary jurisdiction over primary and |
---|
45 | 45 | | secondary education a report that: |
---|
46 | 46 | | (1) evaluates the implementation and progress of the |
---|
47 | 47 | | pilot program under this section; and |
---|
48 | 48 | | (2) makes recommendations regarding the continuation |
---|
49 | 49 | | or expansion of the pilot program. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (j) This section expires September 1, 2023 [2019]. |
---|
51 | 51 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
52 | 52 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
53 | 53 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
54 | 54 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
55 | 55 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|