Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Referred to Property Tax
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Record vote RV#1293
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2019
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|