House | 05/10/2019 | Withdrawn from calendar (contested) | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Filed |