Senate | 05/15/2019 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Record vote RV#554 | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Passed as amended | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Amended 1-Dutton | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Postponed 4/23/19 1:00 PM | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Postponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Filed |