Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB297 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 05/09/2019

                            By: Murr, Burrows, Burns, Canales, Darby, H.B. No. 297
 et al.


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the public school finance system, the elimination of
 school district maintenance and operations ad valorem taxes, and
 the creation of a joint interim committee on the elimination of
 those taxes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 26, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Section 26.035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 26.035.  PROHIBITION ON IMPOSITION OF MAINTENANCE AND
 OPERATIONS TAX BY SCHOOL DISTRICTS; AUTHORIZATION FOR ENRICHMENT
 TAX. (a) Notwithstanding any other law and except as provided by
 Subsection (b), beginning January 1, 2022:
 (1)  a school district may not impose a tax for
 maintenance and operations purposes; and
 (2)  each school district is entitled to funding under
 Chapters 42 and 46, Education Code, for each school year as if the
 district had:
 (A)  a maintenance and operations tax rate equal
 to the state maximum compressed tax rate as defined by Section
 42.101, Education Code; and
 (B)  no local share for purposes of Section
 42.253, Education Code.
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not affect the authority of a school
 district to impose an enrichment tax at a rate not to exceed $0.17
 per $100 of taxable value of property in the district for the
 purpose of providing additional revenue to enrich the educational
 opportunities of students enrolled in the district. The revenue
 attributable to the tax authorized under this subsection is in
 addition to any money received by the district from the state.
 (c)  A reference in this code, the Education Code, or any
 other law to a school district's authority to impose a maintenance
 tax or a maintenance and operations tax may not be construed in a
 manner inconsistent with this section.
 SECTION 2.  (a) In this section, "committee" means the joint
 interim committee on the elimination of school district maintenance
 and operations ad valorem taxes.
 (b)  The joint interim committee on the elimination of school
 district maintenance and operations ad valorem taxes is composed
 of:
 (1)  four members of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (2)  four senators appointed by the lieutenant
 governor;
 (3)  three members appointed by the governor;
 (4)  one advisory member of an organization interested
 in the effect of consumption taxes on low-income and
 moderate-income households and the effect of consumption taxes on
 consumer spending in this state appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives;
 (5)  one advisory member of an organization interested
 in the effect of consumption taxes on low-income and
 moderate-income households and the effect of consumption taxes on
 consumer spending in this state appointed by the lieutenant
 governor;
 (6)  one advisory member of an organization
 representing retailers and other businesses in competition with
 businesses in neighboring states that would be affected by higher
 consumption taxes appointed by the speaker of the house of
 representatives; and
 (7)  one advisory member of an organization
 representing retailers and other businesses in competition with
 businesses in neighboring states that would be affected by higher
 consumption taxes appointed by the lieutenant governor.
 (b-1)  The advisory members appointed under Subsection (b)
 of this section are non-voting members of the committee.
 (c)  The speaker of the house of representatives and the
 lieutenant governor shall make the appointments under Subsection
 (b) of this section not later than the 60th day after the effective
 date of this Act.
 (d)  The speaker of the house of representatives and the
 lieutenant governor shall each designate a co-chair from among the
 committee members.
 (e)  The committee shall convene at the joint call of the
 co-chairs.
 (f)  The committee has all other powers and duties provided
 to a special or select committee by the rules of the senate and
 house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301, Government
 Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees on
 administration.
 (g)  The committee shall consider and evaluate:
 (1)  the effectiveness of increasing the rate or
 expanding the application of consumption taxes currently imposed by
 the state and using the revenue attributable to the increase or
 expansion to meet the state's constitutional duty to make suitable
 provision for the support and maintenance of an efficient system of
 public free schools in the state;
 (2)  the effectiveness of imposing consumption taxes
 not currently imposed by the state and using the revenue
 attributable to the imposition of those taxes to meet the state's
 constitutional duty to make suitable provision for the support and
 maintenance of an efficient system of public free schools in the
 state;
 (3)  the ability of state-imposed consumption taxes to
 adequately respond to annual changes in funding needs that are
 unique to school districts in the state; and
 (4)  the effects of an increase in consumption taxes on
 the residents of this state and businesses located in this state.
 (h)  Not later than November 1, 2020, the committee shall
 provide to the legislature a written report:
 (1)  addressing the feasibility of using consumption
 taxes for the support and maintenance of an efficient system of
 public free schools in the state;
 (2)  proposing a comprehensive plan to use revenue
 attributable to consumption taxes for the support and maintenance
 of an efficient system of public free schools in the state; and
 (3)  proposing legislation necessary to implement the
 comprehensive plan described by Subdivision (2) of this subsection.
 (i)  The proposals made in the report under Subsection (h) of
 this section must allow for the imposition by a school district of
 an ad valorem tax at a rate not to exceed $0.17 per $100 of taxable
 value of property in the district for the purpose of enriching
 educational opportunities for students enrolled in the district.
 (j)  The committee is abolished January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.