House | 04/24/2019 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1142 | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Postponed 4/24/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Postponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to County Affairs | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Filed |