1 | | - | H.B. No. 303 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Paul (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 303 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 4, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural |
---|
| 4 | + | Resources & Economic Development; May 6, 2019, reported adversely, |
---|
| 5 | + | with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas |
---|
| 6 | + | 11, Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 303 By: Miles |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to entities eligible to authorize the creation of |
---|
6 | 14 | | spaceport development corporations and to the powers of those |
---|
7 | 15 | | corporations. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 507.003, Local Government Code, is |
---|
10 | 18 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sec. 507.003. AUTHORITY TO CREATE CORPORATION BY ELIGIBLE |
---|
12 | 20 | | ENTITIES. The following entities are eligible to authorize the |
---|
13 | 21 | | creation under this subtitle of a spaceport development |
---|
14 | 22 | | corporation: |
---|
15 | 23 | | (1) a county; [or] |
---|
16 | 24 | | (2) a municipality with a population of two million or |
---|
17 | 25 | | more; or |
---|
18 | 26 | | (3) a combination of one or more municipalities and |
---|
19 | 27 | | one or more counties. |
---|
20 | 28 | | SECTION 2. Section 507.051, Local Government Code, is |
---|
21 | 29 | | amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to |
---|
22 | 30 | | read as follows: |
---|
23 | 31 | | (b) If a single county authorizes the creation of a |
---|
24 | 32 | | spaceport development corporation, the commissioners court of the |
---|
25 | 33 | | county shall appoint the directors of the corporation. If a single |
---|
26 | 34 | | municipality authorizes the creation of a spaceport development |
---|
27 | 35 | | corporation under Section 507.003(2), the governing body of the |
---|
28 | 36 | | municipality shall appoint the directors of the corporation. |
---|
29 | 37 | | (b-1) If more than one political subdivision authorizes the |
---|
30 | 38 | | creation of a spaceport development corporation, the governing |
---|
31 | 39 | | bodies of the political subdivisions shall appoint the directors |
---|
32 | 40 | | through written agreement between the governing bodies. |
---|
33 | 41 | | SECTION 3. Section 507.103, Local Government Code, is |
---|
34 | 42 | | amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to |
---|
35 | 43 | | read as follows: |
---|
36 | 44 | | (a) This section does not apply to a spaceport development |
---|
37 | 45 | | corporation whose authorizing entity is a single municipality with |
---|
38 | 46 | | a population of two million or more. |
---|
39 | 47 | | (a-1) A spaceport development corporation may exercise the |
---|
40 | 48 | | power of eminent domain to acquire property for a spaceport, |
---|
41 | 49 | | including the power to: |
---|
42 | 50 | | (1) acquire fee title in land condemned; |
---|
43 | 51 | | (2) relocate or modify a railroad, utility line, |
---|
44 | 52 | | pipeline, or other facility that may interfere with a spaceport; or |
---|
45 | 53 | | (3) impose a reasonable restriction on using the |
---|
46 | 54 | | surface of the property for mineral development if the corporation |
---|
47 | 55 | | does not own the mineral rights. |
---|
48 | 56 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
49 | 57 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
50 | 58 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
51 | 59 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
52 | 60 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
55 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 303 was passed by the House on April |
---|
56 | | - | 2, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 1, 1 present, not |
---|
57 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
58 | | - | No. 303 on May 13, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, 1 |
---|
59 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
60 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
61 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
62 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 303 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
63 | | - | amendments, on May 9, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
64 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
66 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Date |
---|
68 | | - | __________________ |
---|
69 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 61 | + | * * * * * |
---|